THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:42:23 AM
Tsoref, Daliah Shoshana Tamar
CPSO#:
94368
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Nov 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of London, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 23 Nov 2010
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2013 |