THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:52:35 AM
Tang, Lan
CPSO#:
94364
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 May 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: Hubei Medical College, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
57-10909 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3E3
Phone: 905-237-6697
Fax: 905-247-9384
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who were treated at Unimedico Family Practice may contact this clinic for medical record inquiries.
Unimedico Family Practice
Unit 110
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan, ON L6A 4P9
Tel: 289 553 3300
Fax: 289 553 2600
Date Received: 11 Dec 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Jan 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Aug 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
|
Active |