THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 11:25:13 AM
Wong, Tiffany Mei-Ling
CPSO#:
94362
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
14 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:27 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 30 Aug 2010 to 26 Sep 2010
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Jan 2014 to 14 Feb 2014
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Feb 2014 |