THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:56:03 AM
Haidar, Ramin
CPSO#:
94361
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dari, English
Education: Queen's University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Upper Level
Hamilton ON L8H 4R6
Phone: 905-540-4433
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Aug 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAMIN HAIDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2012 |