THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:56:19 AM
Blue, Christopher Keith
CPSO#:
94354
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. Matthew's University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1083 Ouellette Ave
3rd Floor
Windsor ON N9A 4J8
Phone: (519) 915-7125
Fax: (519) 962-3339
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KEITH BLUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Sep 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Apr 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2015 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: January 9, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)