THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:05:11 AM
Kovaleva, Maria
CPSO#:
94350
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
15 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Tajik State medical University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Maria Kovaleva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Aug 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jun 2015 |