THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 6:49:10 AM
Le, Hoaan Nguyen
CPSO#:
94348
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5R 3J3
Phone: 416-654-5437
Fax: 647-689-2371
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Northwest Territories
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HOAAN NGUYEN LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2010 to 17 Sep 2010
EL - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 2014 |