THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:55:57 PM
Feroz, Shabana
CPSO#:
94340
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 Aug 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Fresno VA Medical Center
2615 East Clinton Ave
Fresno CA 93703
USA
Phone: 559-225-6100
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Minnesota
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Aug 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 19 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 02 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Aug 2022 |
|
Active |