THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:43:45 AM
Kirchhof, Mark Gajda
CPSO#:
94330
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic
Parkdale Clinic
737 Parkdale Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4M9
Phone: (613) 761-4774
Fax: (613) 761-5093
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital |
Carleton Place |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK GAJDA KIRCHHOF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRCHHOF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2010 to 17 Sep 2010
EL - Infectious Diseases
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Feb 2011 to 13 Mar 2011
EL - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |