THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:00:00 PM
Varughese, Jobin Mathew
CPSO#:
94320
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queen Square Family Health Team
Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON L6V 1P8
Phone: (905) 455-1331
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Nov 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 12 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 26 Oct 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Oct 2012 |
|
Active |