THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:41:20 AM
Bishnoi, Aseem
CPSO#:
94305
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2010 to 09 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2011 to 09 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2015 |