THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:00:11 PM
Scatliff, Robert Matthew
CPSO#:
94291
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Apr 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan St
Kenora ON P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Electoral District: 09
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robert Scatliff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jul 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:10 Oct 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT MATTHEW SCATLIFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCATLIFF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2020 |