THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 12:23:42 PM
Sidhu, Mandeep Kaur
CPSO#:
94248
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
26 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Saurashtra University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jul 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2010 to 18 Oct 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2010 to 26 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2011 to 26 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Jul 2012 |