THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:48:47 AM
Engle, John Raymond
CPSO#:
94246
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ohio State University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Kincardine Community Medical Clinic, 44 Queen Street, Kincardine, ON, N2Z 3C1
Date Received: 02 Jun 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Aug 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Feb 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 07 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2016 |