THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:49:30 AM
Gagnier, Rachel Melissa
CPSO#:
94244
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. R. M. Gagnier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 19 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:19 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RACHEL MELISSA GAGNIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNIER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 14 Aug 2010
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2011 |