THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:30:12 AM
Alkhamesi, Nawar Abdul Hadi Saleh
CPSO#:
94239
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room C8- 116
PO Box 5339
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3985
Fax: (519) 663-3052
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:20 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAWAR ABDUL HADI SALEH ALKHAMESI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALKHAMESI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Jul 2010 to 27 Aug 2010
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2015 |