THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:32:11 AM
Farrugia, Michael David Patrick
CPSO#:
94234
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
107 Victoria St E
Alliston
Ontario
L9R1G7
Alliston ON L9R 1G7
Phone: (705) 434-5358
Fax: (705) 415-1190
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID PATRICK FARRUGIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARRUGIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 29 Jul 2010 to 29 Sep 2010
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2015 |