THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 3:11:13 AM
Mand, Ravinder Paul
CPSO#:
94228
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Dr. East
Brampton ON L6R3J7
Phone: (905) 4942120
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation |
Haliburton |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:19 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAVINDER PAUL MAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 29 Jul 2010 to 26 Aug 2010
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2012 |