THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:55:47 PM
Mestre, Tiago Alexandre
CPSO#:
94208
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: University of Lisboa, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Neurology
Room 2196
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 18986
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Portugal
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:01 Feb 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2010 to 24 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jan 2021 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2024 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2029 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |