THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:12:09 AM
Kim, Dennis S
CPSO#:
94207
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 May 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 May 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2698 Jane Street 2nd Floor
North York ON M3L 1S5
Phone: 416-743-2041
Fax: (416) 743-2045
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. D.S. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DENNIS S KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
EL - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2011 to 23 Feb 2011
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2015 |