THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:01:02 AM
Bhalla, Sunil
CPSO#:
94187
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sint Eustatius, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North Toronto sleep Centre
108-4040 finch avenue
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
Phone: 4162933233
Fax: 4162930692
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:23 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUNIL BHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHALLA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2014 |