THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:40:02 PM
Alsayb, Majd Abdulaziz Abdulmonim
CPSO#:
94123
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Apr 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2010
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 31 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Apr 2016
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2016 |