THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:00:32 AM
Ehsan, Saima
CPSO#:
94094
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Pashto, Urdu
Education: University of Peshawar, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-9630
Fax: (905) 336-9626
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAIMA EHSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EHSAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 Dec 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 25 Dec 2010 to 26 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 27 Sep 2011 to 24 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Dec 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2012 |