THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:20:06 PM
Parker, Torrey May
CPSO#:
94083
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:17 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TORREY MAY PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Ottawa, 04 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2015 |