THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:50:18 PM
Khan, Farah Yaqoob
CPSO#:
94069
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Sind Medical College, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health Hospital
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FARAH YAQOOB KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 29 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Dec 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2011 |