THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:33:13 AM
Tulloch, Trisha Dee-Ann
CPSO#:
94060
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Mar 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Mar 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Howard University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health System
Galaxy 12 Clinic
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7476
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. T. Tulloch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Adolescent Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TRISHA DEE-ANN TULLOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TULLOCH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
CF - Adolescent Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 2014 |