THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:34:01 AM
Johal, Rupinder Kaur
CPSO#:
94059
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Government Medical College, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R3J7
Phone: 9054942120
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:10 May 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RUPINDER KAUR JOHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 12 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 11 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 12 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 12 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Nov 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Feb 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2016 |