THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 9:51:56 AM
Small, Gary Robert
CPSO#:
94040
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Jan 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Wales, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696 7279
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Aug 2010
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 03 Sep 2012
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jan 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Jan 2017 |
|
Active |