THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:56:13 AM
Cioata Tomsa, Elena
CPSO#:
94033
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
303-222 King St E
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 623-6419
Fax: (905) 623-6417
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Aug 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELENA CIOATA TOMSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIOATA TOMSA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 30 Aug 2011 to 29 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2012 |