THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:13:31 AM
Tejani, Shezad
CPSO#:
94006
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 May 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 May 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Wayne State University School of Medicin, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
East York Medical Centre
Suite 27E
45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON M4H 1C3
Phone: (416) 696-9836
Fax: 4166967881
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHEZAD TEJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEJANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 May 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 May 2016 |