THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:26:51 AM
Chaudhry, Shehla Naz
CPSO#:
93983
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LMC Healthcare - London
140 Oxford Street East
Suite 400
London ON N6A 5R9
Phone: 226-680-0802
Fax: 226-680-0800
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:25 Aug 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHEHLA NAZ CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2016 |