THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:50:45 AM
McNaull, Benjamin Brian Alexander
CPSO#:
93981
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
41 Frederick Street
Orillia ON L3V 5W6
Phone: 705.326.7727
Fax: 705.326.1534
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN BRIAN ALEXANDER MCNAULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAULL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Jul 2010
EL - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 20 Sep 2010 to 05 Nov 2010
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2012 |