THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:37:17 AM
Varughese, Rhea Ann
CPSO#:
93922
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:09 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Aug 2010
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2013 to 25 Jun 2013
EL - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |