THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 23:55:45 PM
Hards, Andrea Margaret
CPSO#:
93919
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
Dept Anesthesia
Rm 1E-174
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 416 756 6520
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:07 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREA MARGARET HARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2012 |