THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:09:22 AM
McCloy III, Robert Andrew
CPSO#:
93902
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7
600 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON L2N 7H8
Phone: 2894795540
Fax: 9059845566
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:31 Jul 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT ANDREW MCCLOY III may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCLOY III is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 28 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Jan 2017
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2015 |