THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:05:01 PM
Al Nashmi, Tofol Ahmed Musa
CPSO#:
93854
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Faisal University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2010 to 13 Aug 2010
EL - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2011 to 02 Nov 2011
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2014 |