THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:25:40 PM
Kajal, Babita
CPSO#:
93838
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Jospeh Brant Hospital
Dept of Pathology & Laboratory
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 681-4826
Fax: (905) 336-6483
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:13 May 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BABITA KAJAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAJAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - General Pathology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Hematological Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2016 |