THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:24:58 AM
Cowan, Hamish Jonathan
CPSO#:
93815
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Calgary, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HAMISH JONATHAN COWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COWAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 12 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 13 Jul 2011 to 12 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 13 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 07 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 07 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |