THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 20:25:09 PM
Mailo, Janette Alexandra
CPSO#:
93808
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Date Received: 04 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 07 May 2012 to 03 Jun 2012
EL - Palliative Care Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Dec 2015 to 18 Dec 2015
EL - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2018 |