THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 23:08:30 PM
Mwamwenda-Heinrich, Escort
CPSO#:
93797
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sioux Lookout First Nations Health
Primary Health Care Unit
61 Queen Street
PO Box 1300
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B8
Phone: (807) 737-1802
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site |
Picton |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Jan 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ESCORT MWAMWENDA-HEINRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MWAMWENDA-HEINRICH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 01 Apr 2016
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2014 |