THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:46:23 PM
Chaudhry, Ayeshah
CPSO#:
93787
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 May 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Rawalpindi Medical College, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Genetics- Room 1A100
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: 905-813-4104
Fax: 905-813-4347
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:31 May 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AYESHAH CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2016 |