THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:50:47 PM
Cubillos Salcedo, Javier Enrique
CPSO#:
93746
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
L H S C University Hospital
Dept of Anesthesia & Perioperative
Medicine
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Colombia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Sep 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Aug 2010
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2018 to 31 Aug 2019
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2019 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 25 Jun 2025 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jan 2022 |
|
Active |