THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:49:18 AM
Waserman, Jessica Elizabeth
CPSO#:
93730
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 Feb 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Aug 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Psychiatry
McMaster University, 21 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 19 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2018 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Feb 2024 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 29 Feb 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 29 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |