THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 23:50:15 PM
Renwick, Robert Benson
CPSO#:
93727
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Care London
Parkwood Institute
Mental Health Care Building, F3-225
550 Wellington Rd
London ON N6C 0A7
Phone: 519-455-5110 Ext. 47401
Fax: 519-455-2262
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT BENSON RENWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENWICK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 May 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
EL - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2011 |