THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:00:56 AM
Williams, Phillip Arthur
CPSO#:
93718
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555,
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILLIP ARTHUR WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |