THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:10:02 PM
Al Marzouqi, Omar Mohamed Rafea Ibrahim Mohamed Amin
CPSO#:
93717
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: United Arab Emirates University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:10 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Aug 2010
PEAP - R - General Surgery
Queen's University, 24 Aug 2010 to 23 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 24 Aug 2011 to 23 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 24 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 24 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 24 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |