THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:19:23 AM
Ritsma, Benjamin Ryan
CPSO#:
93713
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
Department Of Physical Medicine
And Rehabilitation
752 King St W
Kingston ON K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN RYAN RITSMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RITSMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 22 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 22 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 22 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 31 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2016 |