THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 0:37:37 AM
Chan, Caroline Lee-Kwan
CPSO#:
93705
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Toronto ON M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:23 Nov 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLINE LEE-KWAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 29 Nov 2011 to 28 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 29 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 May 2015 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2015 |