THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:28:08 AM
Park, Ingrid
CPSO#:
93689
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
N/A
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Connecticut
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:18 Jul 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Sep 2010
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jun 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jul 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2023 |
|
Active |