THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:04:56 PM
Seelisch, Jennifer Lynn
CPSO#:
93677
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Children's Hospital
Div'n of Hematology/Oncology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (519) 685-8494
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
Effective:31 Dec 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNN SEELISCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEELISCH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2016 |